05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on W., P. & W. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |