California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2423 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 02/24/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2423INTRODUCED BILL TEXT INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Bill Berryhill FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 85300 of the Water Code, relating to the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2423, as introduced, Bill Berryhill. Comprehensive Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta planning. Existing law, the Sacramento-San Joaquin Delta Reform Act of 2009, establishes the Delta Stewardship Council as an independent agency of the state. Existing law requires the council, on or before January 1, 2012, to develop, adopt, and commence implementation of a comprehensive management plan for the Delta (Delta Plan), as specified. This bill would make a technical, nonsubstantive change to those provisions. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: no. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 85300 of the Water Code is amended to read: 85300. (a) On or before January 1, 2012, the council shall develop, adopt, and commence implementation of the Delta Plan pursuant to this part that furthers the coequal goals. The Delta Plan shall include subgoals and strategies to assist in guiding state and local agency actions related to the Delta. In developing the Delta Plan, the council shall consider each of the strategies and actions set forth in the Strategic Plan and may include any of those strategies or actions in the Delta Plan. The Delta Plan may also identify specific actions that state or local agencies may take to implement the subgoals and strategies. (b) In developing the Delta Plan, the council shall consult with federal, state, and local agencies with responsibilities in the Delta. All state agencies with responsibilities in the Delta shall cooperate with the council in developing the Delta Plan, upon request of the council. (c) The council shall review the Delta Plan at least once every five years and may revise  it   the Delta Plan  as the council deems appropriate. The council may request any state agency with responsibilities in the Delta to make recommendations with respect to revision of the Delta Plan. (d) (1) The council shall develop the Delta Plan consistent with all of the following: (A) The federal Coastal Zone Management Act of 1972 (16 U.S.C. Sec. 1451 et seq.), or an equivalent compliance mechanism. (B) Section 8 of the federal Reclamation Act of 1902. (C) The federal Clean Water Act (33 U.S.C. Sec. 1251 et seq.). (2) If the council adopts a Delta Plan pursuant to the federal Coastal Zone Management Act of 1972 (16 U.S.C. Sec. 1451 et seq.), the council shall submit the Delta Plan for approval to the United States Secretary of Commerce pursuant to that act, or to any other federal official assigned responsibility for the Delta pursuant to a federal statute enacted after January 1, 2010. (e) The council shall report to the Legislature no later than March 31, 2012, as to its adoption of the Delta Plan.