05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/30/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 24). | |||
04/18/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 8. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and V.A. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |