California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2427 Amended / Bill

Filed 08/06/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2427AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 6, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JUNE 21, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 2, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Butler FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 89708 of, and to add and repeal Section 89012 of, the Education Code, relating to the California State University. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2427, as amended, Butler. California State University: special session fees. Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University, as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. Existing law requires certain fees to be required of, and collected from, students enrolled in each special session, pursuant to rules and regulations prescribed by the Board of Trustees of the California State University. This bill would require  changes to those fees to be publicly noticed, heard, and approved by the board of trustees   information on special session programs and fees to be annually reported to the board of trustees at a publicly noticed meeting of the board of   trustees, and require the report to include, but not be limited to, specified information  . The bill also would require the California State University, commencing on July 1, 2014, and each July 1 thereafter until January 1, 2019, to provide a report including specified information to the Legislature on the California State University Extended and Continuing Education Program. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89012 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89012. (a) Commencing on July 1, 2014, and each July 1 thereafter, the California State University shall provide a report to the Legislature on the California State University Extended and Continuing Education Program, which shall include  both of  the following  information for students who are enrolled in the program on a systemwide and campus-by-campus basis  :  (1) All of the following information for students who are enrolled in the Extended and Continuing Education Program on a systemwide and campus-by-campus basis:   (A) The number of students registered in the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (B) The number of full-time equivalent students enrolled in the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (C) The number of resident undergraduate students who are concurrently enrolled in state-funded courses at the California State University and the Extended and Continuing Education Program, and the number of extension units taken by these students.   (D) The number of extension courses and units taken by the students described in subparagraph (C) that count toward a California State University degree or graduation requirement.   (E) The number of students registered in the Extended and Continuing Education Program who are not concurrently enrolled in state-funded courses at the California State University.   (F) The number of resident undergraduate students enrolled in the Extended and Continuing Education Program who receive federal student loans and state and federal need-based financial aid.   (2) All of the following information on the courses offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program on a systemwide and campus-by-campus basis:   (A) The number of undergraduate courses offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (B) The fees charged for each undergraduate course offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (C) The number of California State University undergraduate courses that receive state funding for which a corresponding or equivalent undergraduate course is offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program, including all of the following information for these courses:   (i) The number of sections offered for each state-funded undergraduate course.   (ii) The number of sections offered for each Extended and Continuing Education Program undergraduate course.   (iii) The number of students enrolled in each state-funded undergraduate course and each Extended and Continuing Education Program undergraduate course.   (D) To the extent possible, a five-year trend for the information provided pursuant to clauses (i) to (iii), inclusive, of subparagraph (C) for each respective course.   (1) The number of students enrolled in special session degree credit courses of the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (2) The number of resident undergraduate students who are concurrently enrolled in state-funded courses at the California State University and special session degree credit courses of the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (3) The number of special session degree credit courses and units offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (4) The number of course sections and units, organized by subject area, offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (5) The range of fees charged for special session degree credit courses offered through the Extended and Continuing Education Program.   (6) To the extent possible, a five-year trend for the information provided pursuant to paragraphs (1) to (5), inclusive.  (b) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2019, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2019, deletes or extends that date. SEC. 2. Section 89708 of the Education Code is amended to read: 89708. (a) Tuition fees adequate, in the long run, to meet the cost of maintaining special sessions in the California State University shall be required of, and collected from, students enrolled in each special session under and pursuant to rules and regulations prescribed by the board of trustees. (b)  Changes to special session fees shall be publicly noticed, heard, and approved by the board of trustees.  Information on special session programs and fees shall be annually reported to the board of trustees at a publicly noticed meeting of the board of trustees. The   report shall include, but not be limited to, the information described in subdivision (a) of Section 89012.  (c) Special sessions," as used in this division, means self-supporting instructional programs conducted by the California State University. The special sessions shall include, but not be limited to, career enrichment and retraining programs. It is the intent of the Legislature that those programs, currently offered on a self-supporting basis by the California State University during summer sessions, may be provided throughout the year, and shall be known as special sessions. The self-supporting special sessions shall not supplant regular course offerings available on a nonself-supporting basis during the regular academic year.