LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2011-2012 Regular Session
Assembly
Bills
AB2427
Draft Versions
CA
California Assembly Bill AB2427
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2011-2012 Regular Session
California Assembly Bill AB2427
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
February 24, 2012
Compare
Amended
Bill
August 6, 2012
Compare
Bill
June 21, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 25, 2012
Compare
Bill
May 2, 2012
Compare