09/13/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 305, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/13/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
08/20/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m. | |||
08/13/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/13/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4477.). | |||
07/06/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
07/05/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). | |||
06/18/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
05/03/2012 | Referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
04/26/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 2. Page 4564.) | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 23). | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on TRANS. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |