California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2433 Chaptered / Bill

Filed 09/13/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2433CHAPTERED BILL TEXT CHAPTER 305 FILED WITH SECRETARY OF STATE SEPTEMBER 13, 2012 APPROVED BY GOVERNOR SEPTEMBER 13, 2012 PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 13, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY APRIL 26, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MARCH 29, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Hill FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to amend Section 66540.12 of the Government Code, relating to the San Francisco Bay Area Water Emergency Transportation Authority. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2433, Hill. San Francisco Bay Area Water Emergency Transportation Authority: terms of board members. Existing law establishes the San Francisco Bay Area Water Emergency Transportation Authority (WETA) with specified powers and duties, including, but not limited to, the authority to coordinate the emergency activities of all water transportation and related facilities within the bay area region, as defined. Existing law provides for a board of directors who serve 6-year terms, 3 members of which are appointed by the Governor and one each by the Senate Committee on Rules and the Speaker of the Assembly. This bill would change the terms of directors appointed by the Governor and the Legislature, with respect to the appointments next following the expiration of the initial terms, to between 2 and 6 years, as specified, in order to stagger the expiration dates. Directors appointed to the board thereafter would serve 6-year terms. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 66540.12 of the Government Code is amended to read: 66540.12. (a) The authority shall be governed by a board composed of five members, as follows: (1) Three members shall be appointed by the Governor, subject to confirmation by the Senate. The Governor shall make the initial appointment of these members of the board no later than January 11, 2008. (2) One member shall be appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules. (3) One member shall be appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly. (b) Each member of the board shall be a resident of a county in the bay area region. (c) Public officers associated with an area of government, including planning or water, whether elected or appointed, may be appointed to serve contemporaneously as members of the board. A public agency shall not have more than one representative on the board of the authority. (d) The Governor shall designate one member as the chairperson of the board and one member as the vice chairperson of the board. (e) Except as provided in subdivision (f), the term of a member of the board shall be six years. (f) (1) The appointments next following the expiration of the terms of the initial appointments shall be for the following terms: (A) Two of the members appointed by the Governor shall serve terms of two years and one shall serve a term of six years. (B) The member appointed by the Senate Committee on Rules shall serve a term of four years. (C) The member appointed by the Speaker of the Assembly shall serve a term of four years. (2) Each member appointed after the expiration of the terms set forth in subparagraphs (A) to (C), inclusive, of paragraph (1) shall serve a term of six years. (g) Vacancies shall be filled immediately by the appointing power for the unexpired portion of the terms in which they occur.