|
08/31/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Leno.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 15. Noes 19. Page 4975.). Motion to reconsider made by Senator Leno. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 4976.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) (June 28). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 47. Noes 24. Page 5193.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 10. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|