|
09/28/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 703, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 55. Noes 20. Page 6116.).
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 22 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4575.).
|
|
|
|
08/07/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (July 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/04/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 54. Noes 20. Page 5168.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|