05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/15/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/14/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
05/02/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (February 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/23/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |