|
09/29/2012
|
Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2012
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 52. Noes 26. Page 6660.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 21. Noes 15. Page 4981.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
In committee: Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 7. Noes 4.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 25. Page 5134.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 17).
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and HIGHER ED. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|