California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB245 Latest Draft

Bill / Amended Version Filed 05/11/2011

 BILL NUMBER: AB 245AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 11, 2011 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 25, 2011 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Portantino FEBRUARY 3, 2011 An act to add Section 8262.3 to the Education Code, relating to child care. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 245, as amended, Portantino. Child care: contractors: electronic payment. Existing law authorizes the Superintendent of Public Instruction to enter into and execute local contractual agreements with any public or private entity or agency for the delivery of child care and development services or the furnishing of property, facilities, personnel, supplies, equipment, and administrative services related to the delivery of child care development services. This bill would require the  Controller   State Department of Education  , on and after January 1, 2013,  to pay those contracts   at the request of a contractor for a contract executed by the   department, as described above, to request the Controller to make a payment  via direct deposit by electronic fund transfer into the contractor's account at the financial institution of the contractor's choice.  The bill would require the Controller to make an agreement with one or more financial institutions participating in the Automated Clearing House to establish a program for direct deposit by electronic fund transfer, as specified.  Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 8262.3 is added to the Education Code, to read: 8262.3.  (a)    On and after January 1, 2013,  all contracts executed   at the request of a contractor for a contract executed  by the State Department of Education pursuant to Section 8262  shall be paid by the Controller   , the department shall request the Controller to   make a payment  via direct deposit by electronic fund transfer into the contractor's account at the financial institution of the contractor's choice.  (b) Notwithstanding any other provision of law, the Controller shall make an agreement with one or more financial institutions participating in the Automated Clearing House pursuant to the local rules, and shall establish a program for direct deposit by electronic fund transfer of payments to contractors who authorize the direct deposit thereof by electronic fund transfer into the contractor's account at the financial institution of the contractor's choice.