05/25/2012 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Held under submission. | |||
05/09/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
03/22/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/21/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. GOV. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |