08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
07/02/2012 | In committee: Placed on APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/07/2012 | Referred to Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
05/29/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/29/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 5057.) | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
04/18/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/10/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/15/2012 | Referred to Com. on U. & C. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |