|
09/07/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 261, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/07/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4476.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 4885.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Withdrawn from committee. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4755.)
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 4477.) Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4477.) (Pending re-referral to Com. on A., E., S., T. & I.M.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
In committee: Set first hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and A.,E.,S.,T., & I.M.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|