07/13/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 101, Statutes of 2012. | |||
07/13/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
07/05/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
06/28/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
06/28/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4181.). | |||
06/21/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/20/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
05/14/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/14/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4830.) | |||
05/08/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 8). | |||
04/11/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/22/2012 | Referred to Coms. on V.A. and JUD. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |