California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2477 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 23, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill June 28, 2012
Bill April 23, 2012
Bill April 9, 2012