|
02/01/2012
|
Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. In committee: Set, first hearing. Held under submission.
|
|
|
|
01/12/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/11/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
01/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (January 9).
|
|
|
|
01/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
01/04/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2011
|
Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
06/13/2011
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2011
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2011
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2011
|
Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
|
|
|
|
02/04/2011
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 6.
|
|
|
|
02/03/2011
|
Read first time. To print.
|
|
|