|
06/27/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/23/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F.I.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4708.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (April 30).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B. & F.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on B. & F. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B. & F. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|