BILL NUMBER: AB 2490ENROLLED BILL TEXT PASSED THE SENATE AUGUST 23, 2012 PASSED THE ASSEMBLY AUGUST 28, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE AUGUST 22, 2012 AMENDED IN SENATE JULY 2, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Butler FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 1840) to Division 8 of the Military and Veterans Code, and to add Article 6 (commencing with Section 2695) to Chapter 4 of Title 1 of Part 3 to the Penal Code, relating to veterans. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2490, Butler. Veterans: correctional counselors. Existing law establishes the Department of Veterans Affairs, which is responsible for administering various programs and services for the benefit of veterans. Existing law also authorizes each county board of supervisors to appoint a county veterans service officer to perform specified veterans-related services, including assisting veterans in pursuing claims for federal or state veterans' benefits. This bill would require the Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation to develop guidance policies to assist veterans who are inmates in pursuing claims for federal veterans' benefits, or in establishing rights to any other privilege, preference, care, or compensation provided under federal or state law because of honorable service in the military. The bill would authorize the department to coordinate with the Department of Veterans Affairs and county veterans service officers or veterans service organizations in developing the policies. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Chapter 4 (commencing with Section 1840) is added to Division 8 of the Military and Veterans Code, to read: CHAPTER 4. VETERANS IN STATE PRISON 1840. The Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation shall develop guidance policies relative to the release of veterans who are inmates. The policies shall be developed with the intent to assist veterans who are inmates in pursuing claims for federal veterans' benefits, or in establishing rights to any other privilege, preference, care, or compensation provided under federal or state law because of honorable service in the military. In developing the policies, the department may coordinate with the Department of Veterans Affairs and the county veterans service officer or veterans service organizations. SEC. 2. Article 6 (commencing with Section 2695) is added to Chapter 4 of Title 1 of Part 3 of the Penal Code, to read: Article 6. Veterans In State Prisons 2695. The Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation shall develop guidance policies relative to the release of veterans who are inmates. The policies shall be developed with the intent to assist veterans who are inmates in pursuing claims for federal veterans' benefits, or in establishing rights to any other privilege, preference, care, or compensation provided under federal or state law because of honorable service in the military. In developing the policies, the department may coordinate with the Department of Veterans Affairs and the county veterans service officer or veterans service organizations.