California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2490 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 20, 2012

Amended

Bill August 22, 2012
Bill July 2, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012