|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 647, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:05 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 49. Noes 27. Page 5958.).
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 15 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 24. Noes 12. Page 4476.).
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (July 2).
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (June 12).
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 46. Noes 26. Page 4669.)
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (April 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|