California 2011 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2497 Amended / Bill

Filed 04/19/2012

 BILL NUMBER: AB 2497AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Solorio FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add and repeal Section 89007.7 of the Education Code, relating to the California State University. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2497, as amended, Solorio. California State University: Early Start Program. Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University (CSU), as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. This bill would express the finding and declaration of the Legislature that the trustees adopted an Early Start Program at their May 2010 meeting.  The bill would provide that, on and after January 1, 2014, the trustees and chancellor would have no authority to implement CSU the Early Start Program unless a specific appropriation is made for its implementation in the annual Budget Act.  The bill would require, commencing on January 1, 2014, and every  5   2  years thereafter, that the  trustees and chancellor   Legislative Analyst's Office, in cooperation with the CSU,  submit a report to the Legislature  detailing the impact of   including specified data relating to  the CSU Early Start Program  on student mathematics and English proficiency. The bill would authorize the trustees, as part of that report, to request the Legislature to include a specific appropriation for the implementation of the CSU Early Start Program in the annual Budget Act  . The bill would repeal these provisions on January 1, 2018. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89007.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89007.7. (a) The Legislature finds and declares that the California State University Early Start Program was adopted pursuant to Executive Order No. 1048 at the May 2010 meeting of the Trustees of the California State University  (CSU)  with the stated goal of facilitating a student's graduation through changes in policies on fulfilling entry-level proficiencies in mathematics and English.  (b) Notwithstanding any other law:   (1) On and after January 1, 2014, the trustees and chancellor shall have no authority to implement the California State University (CSU) Early Start Program unless a specific appropriation is made for the implementation of the CSU Early Start Program in the annual Budget Act.   (2)   (   b)  Commencing on January 1, 2014, and every  five   two  years thereafter, the  trustees and chancellor   Legislative Analyst's Office, in cooperation with CSU, shall submit a report to the Legislature detailing the impact of the CSU Early Start Program on student mathematics and English proficiency.  As part of the   The  report to the Legislature required by this  paragraph, the trustees may request the Legislature to include a specific appropriation for the implementation of the CSU Early Start Program in the annual Budget Act. The report shall be submitted in accordance with Section 9795 of the Government Code   subdivision shall include, but not necessarily be limited to, all of the following:   (1) Information on how the CSU Early Start Program increases successful remediation rates as compared to the remediation rates that existed in the 2010-11 academic year.   (2) Information on how the CSU Early Start Program expedites the student remediation process, or otherwise reduces the length of time that students spend on remediation.   (3) Demographic information on participants in the CSU Early Start Program, including information relating to race or ethnicity, household income levels, geographic origins, and other pertinent data.   (4) The number of enrollees in the CSU Early Start Program, counted statewide and by campus, including the number who eventually earned credit from the program.   (5) As observed one year after participating in the CSU Early Start Program, counted statewide and by campus, how many enrollees became proficient, how many did not remediate successfully, and how many were disenrolled from CSU.   (3) Upon receipt of the report required by paragraph (2), the Legislature, as part of the annual deliberations on the proposed state budget, shall review the report and the request, if any, for the inclusion of a specific appropriation for the implementation of the CSU Early Start Program in the annual Budget Act.  (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date.