California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2497 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 16, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 21, 2012

Amended

Bill July 6, 2012
Bill May 25, 2012
Bill April 19, 2012