BILL NUMBER: AB 2497AMENDED BILL TEXT AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY MAY 25, 2012 AMENDED IN ASSEMBLY APRIL 19, 2012 INTRODUCED BY Assembly Member Solorio FEBRUARY 24, 2012 An act to add and repeal Section 89007.7 of the Education Code, relating to the California State University. LEGISLATIVE COUNSEL'S DIGEST AB 2497, as amended, Solorio. California State University: Early Start Program. Existing law establishes the California State University, under the administration of the Trustees of the California State University (CSU), as one of the segments of public postsecondary education in this state. This bill would express the finding and declaration of the Legislature that the trustees adopted an Early Start Program at their May 2010 meeting. The bill would require, commencing on January 1, 2014, and every 2 years thereafter, that the Legislative Analyst's Office, incooperationconsultation with the CSU, submit a report to the Legislature including specified data relating to the CSU Early Start Program. The bill would repeal these provisions on January 1, 2018. Vote: majority. Appropriation: no. Fiscal committee: yes. State-mandated local program: no. THE PEOPLE OF THE STATE OF CALIFORNIA DO ENACT AS FOLLOWS: SECTION 1. Section 89007.7 is added to the Education Code, to read: 89007.7. (a) The Legislature finds and declares that the California State University Early Start Program was adopted pursuant to Executive Order No. 1048 at the May 2010 meeting of the Trustees of the California State University (CSU) with the stated goal of facilitating a student's graduation through changes in policies on fulfilling entry-level proficiencies in mathematics and English. (b) Commencing on January 1, 2014, and every two years thereafter, the Legislative Analyst's Office, incooperationconsultation with CSU, shall submit a report to the Legislature detailing the impact of the CSU Early Start Program on student mathematics and English proficiency. The report to the Legislature required by this subdivision shall include, but not necessarily be limited to, all of the following: (1) Information on how the CSU Early Start Program increases successful remediation rates as compared to the remediation rates that existed in the 2010-11 academic year. (2) Information on how the CSU Early Start Program expedites the student remediation process, or otherwise reduces the length of time that students spend on remediation. (3) Demographic information on participants in the CSU Early Start Program, including information relating to race or ethnicity, household income levels, geographic origins, and other pertinent data. (4) The number of enrollees in the CSU Early Start Program, counted statewide and by campus, including the number who eventually earned credit from the program. (5) As observed one year after participating in the CSU Early Start Program, counted statewide and by campus, how many enrollees became proficient, how many did not remediate successfully, and how many were disenrolled from CSU. (c) This section shall remain in effect only until January 1, 2018, and as of that date is repealed, unless a later enacted statute, that is enacted before January 1, 2018, deletes or extends that date.