|
08/30/2012
|
Ordered to inactive file pursuant to Senate Rule 29. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Dutton.
|
|
|
|
08/22/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (August 6).
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4981.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/30/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 2.) (April 23).
|
|
|
|
03/15/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|