|
09/27/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 675, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/27/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. Urgency clause adopted. Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6758.).
|
|
|
|
08/31/2012
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 5054.).
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (August 29).
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Joint Rule 62(a), file notice suspended. (Page 4895.)
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Joint Rule 61(b)(15) suspended. (Page 4875.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2012
|
From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (July 3).
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 4829.)
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To consent calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (May 1).
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on JUD. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on TRANS. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on TRANS. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|