05/30/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Assembly Member Beth Gaines. | |||
05/29/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
04/30/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/26/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 24). | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on W., P. & W. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |