|
09/30/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 824, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/13/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6605.) Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 56. Noes 24. Page 6661.).
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 31 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/29/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 31. Noes 3. Page 4941.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/21/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (August 16).
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/14/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on G.O. and PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/30/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 50. Noes 24. Page 5137.)
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/03/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on J., E.D. & E. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (April 17). Re-referred to Com. on J., E.D. & E.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on B., P. & C.P. and J., E.D. & E. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|