|
08/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c).
|
|
|
|
08/08/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 4711.)
|
|
|
|
05/02/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 2).
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (February 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/11/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
04/10/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to REV. & TAX. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|