California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2514 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill August 31, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 27, 2012

Amended

Bill August 6, 2012
Bill June 25, 2012
Bill May 1, 2012