California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2515 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 11, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 28, 2012

Amended

Bill August 21, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012