|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 127, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 4183.).
|
|
|
|
06/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/12/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/24/2012
|
Referred to Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4871.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4812.)
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (April 25).
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (April 16). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|