05/31/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 35. Noes 29. Page 5208.). | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/17/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/16/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. Read second time and amended. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 24). | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/17/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. | |||
04/16/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |