08/24/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
08/06/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(c). | |||
07/06/2012 | From inactive file. Ordered to second reading. Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
06/14/2012 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Anderson. | |||
06/13/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 68. Noes 1. Page 4778.) | |||
05/07/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/03/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |