California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2521 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 25, 2012

Amended

Bill August 13, 2012
Bill August 6, 2012
Bill May 8, 2012