05/01/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/19/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
04/17/2012 | In committee: Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Coms. on H. & C.D. and JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on H. & C.D. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |