08/30/2012 | Ordered to inactive file at the request of Senator Yee. | |||
06/28/2012 | From consent calendar. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/26/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/25/2012 | From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and ordered to consent calendar. | |||
06/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/10/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4787.) | |||
05/02/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 2). | |||
04/19/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (April 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |