California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2531 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Enrolled

Bill September 7, 2012

Chaptered

Bill September 19, 2012

Amended

Bill August 7, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012