08/06/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/27/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/24/2012 | Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and PUB. S. | |||
05/17/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/17/2012 | Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 4887.). | |||
05/10/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. | |||
05/09/2012 | From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9). | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: to consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |