|
07/03/2012
|
In committee: Set final hearing. Failed passage. Reconsideration granted.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2012
|
In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 73. Noes 0. Page 4910.)
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 0.) (May 8).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
Referred to Com. on PUB. S. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|