08/16/2012 | In committee: Held under submission. | |||
08/06/2012 | In committee: Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
06/26/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 3.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 52. Noes 21. Page 5140.) | |||
05/29/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (May 25). Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/16/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file. | |||
05/02/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (April 24). | |||
03/19/2012 | Referred to Com. on HUM. S. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |