07/03/2012 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Failed passage. | |||
06/18/2012 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/14/2012 | Referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
05/31/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
05/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 19. Page 5144.) | |||
05/22/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/21/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
05/17/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (May 2). | |||
04/24/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |