09/19/2012 | Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 391, Statutes of 2012. | |||
09/19/2012 | Approved by the Governor. | |||
08/23/2012 | Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m. | |||
08/20/2012 | In Assembly. Ordered to Engrossing and Enrolling. | |||
08/20/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 23. Noes 15. Page 4571.). | |||
06/26/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
06/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 25). | |||
06/13/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/17/2012 | Referred to Com. on ED. | |||
04/30/2012 | In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. | |||
04/30/2012 | Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 49. Noes 24. Page 4597.) | |||
04/25/2012 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (April 25). | |||
04/12/2012 | From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |