05/31/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 33. Noes 32. Page 5212.). | |||
05/25/2012 | Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 46. Noes 19. Page 4987.) Ordered to third reading. Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Ayes 45. Noes 22. Page 4987.) | |||
05/14/2012 | May 24-Motion to reconsider continued. | |||
05/10/2012 | Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 39. Noes 27. Page 4791.). Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Feuer. | |||
05/02/2012 | Read second time. Ordered to third reading. | |||
05/01/2012 | Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading. | |||
04/30/2012 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (April 17). | |||
04/09/2012 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
03/29/2012 | Referred to Com. on JUD. From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on JUD. Read second time and amended. | |||
02/27/2012 | Read first time. | |||
02/26/2012 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 27. | |||
02/24/2012 | Introduced. To print. |