|
09/23/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 486, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
09/23/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 12:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 6425.).
|
|
|
|
08/27/2012
|
Assembly Rule 77 suspended. (Page 6357.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after August 28 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 4785.).
|
|
|
|
08/15/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/14/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2012
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8 and be amended.
|
|
|
|
08/06/2012
|
In committee: Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/03/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/27/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to committee. Read second time, amended, and re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/19/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on E.Q. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on E.Q.
|
|
|
|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on E., U. & C. and E.Q.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 4976.)
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time and amended. Ordered to third reading. (Page 4913.)
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/09/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
04/26/2012
|
From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/18/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (April 9).
|
|
|
|
04/09/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on U. & C. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Coms. on U. & C. and L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|