02/01/2012 | Died pursuant to Art. IV, Sec. 10(c) of the Constitution. From committee: Filed with the Chief Clerk pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/03/2011 | In committee: Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/07/2011 | From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (April 7). Re-referred to Com. on B., P. & C.P. | |||
04/04/2011 | Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96. | |||
03/31/2011 | From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended. | |||
03/30/2011 | In committee: Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
02/18/2011 | Referred to Com. on L. GOV. | |||
02/04/2011 | From printer. May be heard in committee March 6. | |||
02/03/2011 | Read first time. To print. |