California 2011-2012 Regular Session

California Assembly Bill AB2563 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 24, 2012

Amended

Bill June 27, 2012
Bill June 6, 2012
Bill April 30, 2012
Bill March 29, 2012