|
06/07/2012
|
Referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 70. Noes 0. Page 4986.)
|
|
|
|
05/17/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/16/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. To consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (May 16).
|
|
|
|
04/25/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2012
|
Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (April 18).
|
|
|
|
04/16/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/12/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on G.O. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/29/2012
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. Re-referred. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (March 29). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
03/22/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
|
|
|
|
03/20/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|