|
07/13/2012
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State - Chapter 103, Statutes of 2012.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2012
|
Approved by the Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/05/2012
|
Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2012
|
Senate amendments concurred in. To Engrossing and Enrolling. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 5523.).
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
In Assembly. Concurrence in Senate amendments pending. May be considered on or after June 27 pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.
|
|
|
|
06/25/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Assembly. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 4058.).
|
|
|
|
06/20/2012
|
Ordered to special consent calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2012
|
Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2012
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 13).
|
|
|
|
05/31/2012
|
Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
In Senate. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2012
|
Read third time. Passed. Ordered to the Senate. (Ayes 74. Noes 1. Page 4914.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2012
|
Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/10/2012
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (May 9).
|
|
|
|
03/27/2012
|
Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2012
|
From committee chair, with author's amendments: Amend, and re-refer to Com. on L. GOV. Read second time and amended.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2012
|
Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2012
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2012
|
From printer. May be heard in committee March 27.
|
|
|
|
02/24/2012
|
Introduced. To print.
|
|
|